+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Final disposition: Held awaiting committee of whole
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration with recommendation for a floor amendment
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On January 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (3)
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
+ − Vote
January 13, 2011: Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor