+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Failed
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- Objection to the consent calendar.
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 3:59PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- House Government and Higher Education Committee: do pass.
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Government and Higher Education Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:05PM.
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Education Committee: do pass.
On January 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Education Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Votes (10)
March 10, 2016: Third read: failed (House)
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 30
- Present/NV: 2
March 10, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 30
February 18, 2016: Government and Higher Education: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 3
February 18, 2016: House Government and Higher Education Committee
- Yeas: 6
February 18, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 18, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
February 8, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 30
February 8, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
January 14, 2016: Senate Education Committee
- Yeas: 7
January 14, 2016: Education: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7