+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
- Final reading in Senate: Passed
- Senate concurred.
- Conference committee recommended.
- Senate Minority Caucus.
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Floor Amend to Carter Floor Amend to Bill - Cobb - passed
- MVRA - passed
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: retained on calendar.
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: retained on calendar.
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- House Military, Veterans and Regulatory Affairs Committee: do pass amended.
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Military, Veterans and Regulatory Affairs Committee.
- First read in House.
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- COMPS (ref Bill) adopted
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee: do pass amended.
On January 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
April 25, 2017: Senate Final Reading
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 8
April 20, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 18
March 8, 2017: House Military, Veterans and Regulatory Affairs Committee
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
March 8, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 6
March 1, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 10
January 18, 2017: Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor