+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (42)
On June 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: Conference engrossed version
- Chapter: 250 e
- Action: Signed
On June 14, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On June 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On June 7, 2007 in the House:
- House final read: Passed
On May 24, 2007 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On May 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate final read: Passed
- Senate adopts conference committee
On May 23, 2007 in the House:
- House adopts conference committee
On April 18, 2007 in the House:
- House appointed: Adams, Farley, Mclain
- Recommendation: that the bill be accepted as originally passed by the Senate and be further amended.
On April 17, 2007 in the Senate:
- Conference committee recommended
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Senate appointed: Flake, Blendu, Miranda
On April 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 2, 2007 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 29, 2007 in the House:
- Amendment failed: Floor Amend to Bill - Gallardo
- Amendment passed: GOV
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 27, 2007 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 6, 2007 in the House:
- Government: Do pass amended
On February 13, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On February 12, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Government
- House first read
On February 5, 2007 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 5, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: Flake flr amend (ref Bill)
On January 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On January 29, 2007 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 12:20 pmobject
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On January 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Government: Do pass
On January 17, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (10)
Flake Floor Amendment, reference to printed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
Government
House Adopted Amendment
Conference Committee
Conference Adopted Amendment
Flake Floor Amendment, reference to printed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
Conference Committee
Conference Adopted Amendment
4-11 house changes memo
Senate Fact Sheet
Government
House Adopted Amendment
7-18 as enacted
Senate Fact Sheet
2-7aspassedbysenate
Senate Fact Sheet
1-18gov
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (7)
June 7, 2007: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 4
May 24, 2007: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 23
- Present/NV: 7
April 2, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 5
February 12, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 10
February 12, 2007: Government: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
February 5, 2007: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 30
January 16, 2007: Government: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor