+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (45)
On July 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 175
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On July 1, 2009 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- Senate concurrence
- Senate final read: Passed
- Transmitted to: Governor
On June 30, 2009 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On June 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On June 29, 2009 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment: JUD - passed as amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to JUD - Driggs
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Kavanagh
On June 26, 2009 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On June 25, 2009 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass amended
On June 18, 2009 in the House:
- House second read
On June 17, 2009 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On June 16, 2009 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On June 16, 2009 in the Senate:
- Vote detail 18 10 2 0 w/o y passed
- Motion
- Senator harper motion to reconsider whereby the Senate failed to pass sb1113 on third reading on june 15, 2009. motion carried.
On June 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Third read: Failed
On June 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: JUD (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: RULES (ref JUD)
- Amendment adopted: Pearce flr amend (ref JUD)
- Amendment adopted: Harper flr amend (ref JUD)
- Amendment failed: Cheuvront #1 flr amend (ref JUD)
- Amendment failed: Cheuvront #2 flr amend (ref JUD)
- COW motion
- Sen cheuvront to include the cheuvront #2 flr amendment
On June 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended with recommendation for a floor amendment
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On June 8, 2009 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On June 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On January 14, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (17)
Driggs Floor amendment, reference to the Judiciary Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Judiciary
House Adopted Amendment
Judiciary - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Pearce Floor Amendment; reference to JUD amendment
Senate Adopted Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Judiciary
Senate Proposed Amendment
Judiciary
Senate Proposed Amendment
Judiciary - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Harper Floor Amendment; reference to JUD amendment
Senate Adopted Amendment
Judiciary - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Judiciary
Senate Proposed Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Judiciary
Senate Proposed Amendment
Judiciary - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Pearce Floor Amendment; reference to JUD amendment
Senate Adopted Amendment
Kavanagh Floor amendment, reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Harper Floor Amendment; reference to JUD amendment
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
July 1, 2009: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 3
June 30, 2009: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 1
June 17, 2009: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
June 17, 2009: Judiciary: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
June 16, 2009: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 2
June 15, 2009: Third read: failed (Senate)
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 2
June 4, 2009: Judiciary: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor