+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 14, 2010 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 55
- Action: Signed
On April 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 7, 2010 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 6, 2010 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 5, 2010 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 17, 2010 in the House:
- Health and Human Services: Do pass
On March 16, 2010 in the House:
- House second read
On March 15, 2010 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Health and Human Services
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 1, 2010 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 16, 2010 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 1:48 pm
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 3, 2010 in the Senate:
- Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass
On January 19, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety and Human Services
- Senate second read
On January 14, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendment
2-1 pshs
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 7, 2010: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 54
- Present/NV: 6
March 15, 2010: Health and Human Services: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
March 15, 2010: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 3
March 1, 2010: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 1
January 19, 2010: Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor