+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Final disposition: Retained on committee of whole calendar
- Committee of the Whole: Retained
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration with recommendation for a floor amendment
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Safety: Do pass
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety
- Senate first read
+ − Amendment
1-28 ps
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (2)
January 23, 2013: Public Safety: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
January 23, 2013: Rules: Proper for consideration with recommendation for a floor amendment (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor