+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 29, 2009 in the House:
- Final disposition: Held in House
- Amendment: GOV - passed by standing division 24-23
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On June 26, 2009 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Government: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On June 18, 2009 in the House:
- House second read
On June 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On June 17, 2009 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On June 16, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On June 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On June 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Government Institutions: Do pass
On June 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Government Institutions
- Senate second read
On January 14, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (5)
Government - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Government - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Government - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Government - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
1111GOV
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (4)
June 17, 2009: Government: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
June 17, 2009: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
June 17, 2009: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
June 4, 2009: Government Institutions: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor