+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:18PM.
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Finance Committee: do pass.
On January 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Finance Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Vote
January 20, 2021: Senate Finance Committee
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor