+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 70
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Third read: Passed
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Agriculture and Water: Do pass
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Agriculture and Water
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: APPROP (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Shooter flr amend (ref APPROP)
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (7)
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Shooter flr amend (ref APPROP) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Shooter flr amend (ref APPROP) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
2-21 approp_strikermemo
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 14, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 5
March 11, 2014: Agriculture and Water: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
March 11, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 4
March 6, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 4
February 18, 2014: Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor