+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred.
- Final reading in Senate: Passed
- Transmit to Governor.
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus.
- Conference committee recommended.
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- HEALTH - withdrawn
- Amended by APPROP - Shooter - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- House Health Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Health Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- HHS (ref Bill) adopted
- Brophy McGee flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Health and Human Services Committee: do pass amended.
On January 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Health and Human Services Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (7)
April 26, 2017: Senate Final Reading
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 6
April 17, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 14
March 16, 2017: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 13
March 2, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
March 2, 2017: House Health Committee
- Yeas: 9
February 23, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
January 18, 2017: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor