+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 163
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate concurrence
- Senate final read: Passed
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: COM
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to COM - Farnsworth
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- House second read
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: NRRA (ref Bill)
- Third read: Passed
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Natural Resources and Rural Affairs: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On January 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Natural Resources and Rural Affairs
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (13)
Natural Resources and Rural Affairs - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Commerce - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Natural Resources and Rural Affairs - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Commerce - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Farnsworth Floor Amendment; Reference to COMMERCE Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Natural Resources and Rural Affairs - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Commerce - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Natural Resources and Rural Affairs - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Commerce - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Farnsworth Floor Amendment; Reference to COMMERCE Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
2-18 nrra_strikermemo
Senate Fact Sheet
2-20 nrra_strikermemo_caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
1-28 nrra
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
April 22, 2013: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
April 1, 2013: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 2
March 13, 2013: Commerce: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
March 13, 2013: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
March 6, 2013: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
January 22, 2013: Natural Resources and Rural Affairs: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor