+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Chapter: 109
- Action: Signed
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- Senate final read: Passed
- Senate concurrence
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Carter
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Health: Do pass
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- House second read
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Health
- House first read
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: Yee flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: HHS (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On January 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Health and Human Services: Do pass amended
- Senate second read
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Health and Human Services
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (13)
Health and Human Services
Senate Proposed Amendment
Yee flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Health and Human Services
Senate Adopted Amendment
Carter Floor Amendment; Reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Yee flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Health and Human Services
Senate Proposed Amendment
Carter Floor Amendment; Reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Health and Human Services
Senate Adopted Amendment
4-1 hhs_housechanges
Senate Fact Sheet
3-5 hhs_aspassed
Senate Fact Sheet
1-28 hhs_caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
1-22 hhs
Senate Fact Sheet
4-22 hhs_asenacted
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
April 11, 2013: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 3
March 25, 2013: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 2
February 19, 2013: Health: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
February 19, 2013: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
February 18, 2013: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 2
January 22, 2013: Health and Human Services: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor