+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Failed
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- FIN (ref Bill) adopted
- Petersen flr amend (ref FIN) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: retained.
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: retained.
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Finance Committee: do pass amended.
- Second read in Senate.
On January 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Finance Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
March 1, 2018: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 16
January 11, 2018: Senate Finance Committee
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor