+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On August 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
- Governor Action: Signed
On July 31, 2023 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
- Conference committee recommended.
- Senate Minority Caucus.
- Senate concurred.
- Final reading in Senate: PASSED
On July 31, 2023 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Amended by APPROP - passed as amended
- Floor Amend to APPROP - Cook - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: PASSED
On April 3, 2023 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On March 22, 2023 in the House:
- House Transportation & Infrastructure Committee: do pass.
On February 28, 2023 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 27, 2023 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Transportation & Infrastructure Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
On February 16, 2023 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- APPROP (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On February 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass amended.
On January 30, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Transportation and Technology Committee: do pass.
On January 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 19, 2023 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Transportation and Technology Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (9)
July 31, 2023: Senate Final Reading
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 7
July 31, 2023: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 14
February 27, 2023: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 6
February 27, 2023: House Transportation & Infrastructure Committee
- Yeas: 11
February 27, 2023: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 16, 2023: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 2
January 19, 2023: Senate Transportation and Technology Committee
- Yeas: 7
January 19, 2023: Senate Appropriations1 Committee
- Yeas: 10
January 19, 2023: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 10