+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: Discussed and Held.
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- House Education Committee: do pass.
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Education Committee.
- First read in House.
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- ED (ref Bill) withdrawn
- APPROP (ref Bill) adopted
- Carter flr amend (ref APPROP) adopted
- Carter flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass amended.
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Education Committee: do pass amended.
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Education Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (4)
March 18, 2019: House Education Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 4
March 6, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
January 22, 2019: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 9
January 22, 2019: Senate Education Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor