+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred.
- Final reading in Senate: Passed
- Transmit to Governor.
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus.
- Conference committee recommended.
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- Amended by BI - passed as amended
- Floor Amend to BI - Allen - substituted
- SUB Floor Amend to Allen Floor Amend to BI - Butler - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: Passed
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- House Banking and Insurance Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- House Ways and Means Committee: withdrawn.
- Referred to House Banking and Insurance Committee.
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Ways and Means Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Petersen flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration with recommendation for a floor amendment.
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Finance Committee: do pass.
- Second read in Senate.
On January 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Finance Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
April 25, 2018: Senate Final Reading
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 3
April 18, 2018: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 26
March 5, 2018: House Banking and Insurance Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
February 19, 2018: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 8, 2018: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 12
January 11, 2018: Senate Finance Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor