+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 195
- Action: Signed
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 3:00 pm
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Education: Do pass
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- House second read
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 1:03 pm
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Education: Do pass
On January 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Senate first read
+ − Amendment
1-22 ed
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 25, 2013: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 52
- Present/NV: 8
February 18, 2013: Education: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
February 18, 2013: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
February 6, 2013: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
January 22, 2013: Education: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor