+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 181
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Government: Do pass
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:20 pm
On February 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Government and Environment: Do pass
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Government and Environment
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendment
2-13 ge
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 17, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Present/NV: 3
March 5, 2014: Government: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
March 5, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 3
February 27, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 30
January 21, 2014: Government and Environment: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (34)
Type:
Primary Sponsor