+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 19, 2008 in the House:
- Final disposition: Held in House
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On May 13, 2008 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Amended constitutional and in proper form
On April 8, 2008 in the House:
- Government: Do pass
On April 2, 2008 in the House:
- Health: Do pass
On March 26, 2008 in the House:
- House second read
On March 25, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Assigned to committee: Health
- House first read
On March 18, 2008 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 18, 2008 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: HEALTH (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 6, 2008 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 25, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 14, 2008 in the Senate:
- Health: Do pass amended
On January 17, 2008 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Withdrawn
- Senate second read
On January 16, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Health
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (8)
+ − Votes (5)
March 25, 2008: Government: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
March 25, 2008: Health: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 2
March 25, 2008: Rules: Amended constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
March 18, 2008: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 12
January 16, 2008: Health: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor