+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 2:02PM.
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- House Ways and Means Committee: do pass.
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Ways and Means Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- FIN (ref Bill) adopted
- RULES (ref FIN) withdrawn
- Petersen flr amend (ref FIN) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration amended.
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Finance Committee: do pass amended.
On January 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Senate Government Committee: withdrawn.
- Referred to Senate Government Committee.
- Referred to Senate Finance Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (5)
March 19, 2018: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 2
February 22, 2018: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 6
February 22, 2018: House Ways and Means Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 21, 2018: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
January 10, 2018: Senate Finance Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor