+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 232
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Government: Do pass
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs: Do pass
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On January 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:20 pm
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Government and Environment: Do pass
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Government and Environment
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendment
1-21 ge
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
April 23, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 55
- Present/NV: 5
February 20, 2014: Government: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
February 20, 2014: Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
February 20, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 3
February 3, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
January 21, 2014: Government and Environment: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (41)
Type:
Primary Sponsor