+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
- Final reading in Senate: PASSED
- Senate concurred.
- Conference committee recommended.
- Senate Minority Caucus.
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- HHS - passed
- Floor Amend to Bill - Barto - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Floor Amend to Bill - Petersen - passed
- Third read in House: PASSED
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: retained on calendar.
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- House Health & Human Services Committee: do pass amended.
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Health & Human Services Committee.
- First read in House.
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- HEWD (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Higher Education and Workforce Development Committee: do pass amended.
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Higher Education and Workforce Development Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (7)
May 7, 2019: Senate Final Reading
- Yeas: 29
May 6, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 58
February 26, 2019: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 6
February 26, 2019: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 3
February 26, 2019: House Health & Human Services Committee
- Yeas: 9
February 12, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
January 22, 2019: Senate Higher Education and Workforce Development Committee
- Yeas: 7