+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus.
- Conference committee recommended.
- Senate concurred.
- Final reading in Senate: PASSED
- Transmit to Governor.
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- Amended by HHS - passed
- Floor Amend to HHS - Butler - failed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Representative Butler to include the Butler flr amendment to SB1096
- Third read in House: PASSED
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- House Health & Human Services Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Health & Human Services Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- TAT (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Transportation and Technology Committee: do pass amended.
On January 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Transportation and Technology Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
March 16, 2021: Senate Final Reading
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 2
March 11, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 26
February 23, 2021: House Health & Human Services Committee
- Yeas: 6
February 23, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
February 9, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 29
January 20, 2021: Senate Transportation and Technology Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor