+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 21, 2007 in the House:
- Final disposition: Held in House
- House second read
On May 17, 2007 in the House:
- Rules
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- House first read
- Transmit to House
On May 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: APPROP (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Burns flr amend (ref APPROP)
- Third read: Passed
On May 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On May 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 28, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
On January 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Senate second read
On January 10, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (10)
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Burns Floor Amendment, reference to APPROP amendment
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
May 16, 2007: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 2
February 28, 2007: Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1