+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
- Final reading in Senate: PASSED
- Senate concurred.
- Senate Minority Caucus.
- Conference committee recommended.
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- PS - passed
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Committee of the Whole consent calendar at 4:00PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- House Public Safety Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Public Safety Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Livingston flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: retained.
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Objection to the consent calendar.
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:10PM.
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee: do pass.
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
April 10, 2019: Senate Final Reading
- Yeas: 29
April 9, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 11
February 26, 2019: House Public Safety Committee
- Yeas: 6
February 26, 2019: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 13, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
January 17, 2019: Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor