+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (37)
On May 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Vetoed
On May 3, 2018 in the House:
- Final reading in House: Passed
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate adopted conference committee report.
- Final reading in Senate: Passed
On May 3, 2018 in the House:
- House adopted conference committee report.
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate caucus on conference committee report.
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conference committee recommended.
- Senate Minority Caucus.
- Senate members appointed to conference committee: PETERSEN, FARLEY, GRAY
- Conference committee recommendation: That the Senate accept the House amendments with exceptions and the bill be further amended.
On May 2, 2018 in the House:
- House caucus on conference committee report.
On May 1, 2018 in the House:
- House members appointed to conference committee: WENINGER, EPSTEIN, TOMA
On April 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On April 30, 2018 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
- WM
- SUB Floor to WM - Weninger - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On April 23, 2018 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- House Ways and Means Committee: do pass amended.
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Ways and Means Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- FIN (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Finance Committee: do pass amended.
On January 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Finance Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (7)
May 3, 2018: House Final Reading
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 6
May 3, 2018: Senate Final Reading
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 2
April 30, 2018: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 14
February 19, 2018: House Ways and Means Committee
- Yeas: 6
February 19, 2018: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 6
February 8, 2018: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 13
January 10, 2018: Senate Finance Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3