+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Chapter: 81
- Action: Signed
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- Senate final read: Passed
- Senate concurrence
- Concurrence recommended
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Lovas
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Government and Higher Education: Do pass
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Government and Higher Education
- House first read
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 1:40 pm
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Government: Do pass
On January 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (2)
Government
Senate Proposed Amendment
Floor Amend to Bill - Lovas - passed
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
March 24, 2015: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
March 18, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 3
February 26, 2015: Government and Higher Education: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
February 26, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
February 19, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
January 21, 2015: Government: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor