+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 21, 2007 in the House:
- Final disposition: Held in House
- House second read
On May 17, 2007 in the House:
- Rules
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- House first read
- Transmit to House
On May 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: APPROP (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: RULES (ref APPROP)
- Amendment adopted: Burns flr amend (ref APPROP)
- Amendment failed: Gray L flr amend (ref APPROP)
- COW motion
- Senator harper to include l gray flr amendment
- Third read: Passed
On May 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
On May 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 28, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
On January 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Senate second read
On January 10, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (7)
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Burns Floor Amendment, reference to APPROP amendment
Senate Adopted Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Burns Floor Amendment, reference to APPROP amendment
Senate Adopted Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
May 16, 2007: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 3
February 28, 2007: Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1