+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 20, 2010 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 106
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On April 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 13, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 13, 2010 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 12, 2010 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On April 8, 2010 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 24, 2010 in the House:
- Health and Human Services: Do pass
On March 9, 2010 in the House:
- House second read
On March 8, 2010 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Health and Human Services
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 12, 2010 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 2:44 pm
On January 27, 2010 in the Senate:
- Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass
On January 19, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety and Human Services
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On January 14, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendment
1-25 pshs
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 13, 2010: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 55
- Present/NV: 5
March 8, 2010: Health and Human Services: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
March 8, 2010: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
February 11, 2010: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 1
January 19, 2010: Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor