+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment: WM - passed as amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to WM - Olson
- Final disposition: Held in House
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Ways and Means: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Ways and Means
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Amendment failed: Farley flr amend (ref Bill)
- Motion to amend Committee of the Whole action: Senator Farley to include the Farley floor amendment
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 10:13 amobject
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass
On January 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (5)
Finance
Senate Proposed Amendment
Farley flr amend (ref Bill) failed
Senate Proposed Amendment
Ways and Means - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Ways and Means - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Floor Amend to WM - Olson - passed
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 18, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
February 18, 2015: Ways and Means: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
February 16, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 1
January 21, 2015: Finance: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor