+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 180
- Action: Signed
On April 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 12, 2011 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 4, 2011 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 2:10 pm
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 30, 2011 in the House:
- Appropriations: Do pass
On March 29, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Government: Withdrawn
On March 23, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
On March 22, 2011 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 21, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: Allen flr amend (ref BSFSS)
- Amendment adopted: BSFSS (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty
On January 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (9)
Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty
Senate Proposed Amendment
Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Allen flr amend (ref BSFSS) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Allen flr amend (ref BSFSS) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty
Senate Proposed Amendment
2-16 bsfss_strikermemo
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 12, 2011: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 25
- Present/NV: 1
March 29, 2011: Appropriations: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 2
March 22, 2011: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
March 21, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 3
February 10, 2011: Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor