+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 194
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 4:37 pm
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Transportation: Do pass
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- House second read
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- Assigned to committee: Transportation
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: Burges flr amend (ref Bill)
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration with recommendation for a floor amendment
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transportation: Do pass
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Transportation
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (4)
Burges flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Burges flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
1-25 trans
Senate Fact Sheet
2-18 trans_aspassed
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
April 16, 2013: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 13
February 19, 2013: Commerce: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
February 19, 2013: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
February 19, 2013: Transportation: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
February 18, 2013: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 30
January 17, 2013: Transportation: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor