+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Final disposition: Failed in committee of whole
- Committee of the Whole: Failed to pass
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 1:09 pmobject
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Safety: Do pass
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety
- Senate first read
+ − Amendment
1-28 ps
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Vote
January 17, 2013: Public Safety: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor