+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 4, 2012 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 171
- Action: Signed
On April 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On March 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 29, 2012 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 6, 2012 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 1:39 pm
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass
On February 14, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On January 26, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On January 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On January 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On January 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 2:10 pm
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On January 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Commerce and Energy: Do pass
On January 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 11, 2012 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Commerce and Energy
- Senate first read
+ − Amendment
1-13 ce
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
March 29, 2012: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 4
February 13, 2012: Commerce: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
February 13, 2012: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
January 26, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
January 11, 2012: Commerce and Energy: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsors (55)
Type:
Primary Sponsor