+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 29, 2023 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass amended.
On March 21, 2023 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 20, 2023 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On March 14, 2023 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On March 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- APPROP (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On March 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 6, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass amended.
On February 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Health and Human Services Committee: do pass.
On February 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 31, 2023 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Health and Human Services Committee.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
March 20, 2023: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 2
March 14, 2023: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 6
January 31, 2023: Senate Appropriations1 Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 3
January 31, 2023: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 3
January 31, 2023: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor