+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 10, 2007 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 31
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On April 4, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 2, 2007 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 27, 2007 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Consent calendar: 11:30 am
On March 7, 2007 in the House:
- Environment: Do pass
On February 15, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On February 14, 2007 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Environment
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 5, 2007 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 5, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Amendment failed: Johnson flr amend (ref Bill)
On January 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On January 29, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 12:20 pmobject
On January 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- Commerce and Economic Development: Do pass
On January 17, 2007 in the Senate:
- Natural Resources and Rural Affairs: Do pass
On January 11, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 10, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Natural Resources and Rural Affairs
- Assigned to committee: Commerce and Economic Development
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (3)
Commerce and Economic Development
Senate Proposed Amendment
1-12 nrra-ced
Senate Fact Sheet
Commerce and Economic Development
Senate Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
April 2, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 5
February 14, 2007: Environment: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 2
February 14, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 10
February 5, 2007: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 4
January 10, 2007: Commerce and Economic Development: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 8
January 10, 2007: Natural Resources and Rural Affairs: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7