+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (49)
On June 6, 2008 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: Conference engrossed version
- Chapter: 257
- Action: Signed
On June 2, 2008 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On May 28, 2008 in the Senate:
- Sen waring substitute motion to refuse to concur and appoint a free cc. motion carried
- Sen harper motion to refuse to concur and appoint a simple cc.
- Motion to concur.motion failed
- Miscellaneous motion
- Transmit to Senate
On May 28, 2008 in the House:
- House final read: Passed
On May 22, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate adopts conference committee
- Senate final read: Passed
On May 22, 2008 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On May 21, 2008 in the House:
- House adopts conference committee
- House adopt
On April 30, 2008 in the House:
- Recommendation: that the Senate accept the House amendments with exceptions and the bill be further amended.
- House appointed: Biggs, Mcclure, Prezelski
On April 29, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate appointed: Waring, Gould, Rios
On April 22, 2008 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 17, 2008 in the Senate:
- CONFERENCE COMMITTEE:
- Concurrence recommended
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 10, 2008 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 10, 2008 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 8, 2008 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment: Bill passed on s/v 30-29
- Amendment passed: TRANS
On April 1, 2008 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 27, 2008 in the House:
- Transportation: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On March 19, 2008 in the House:
- House second read
On March 18, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Transportation
- House first read
On March 12, 2008 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 12, 2008 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: APPROP (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 4, 2008 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 3, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 26, 2008 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass amended
On January 29, 2008 in the Senate:
- Transportation: Do pass
On January 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 14, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Transportation
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (13)
Transportation - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Adopted Amendment
Conference Committee
Conference Adopted Amendment
Transportation - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Transportation - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Adopted Amendment
Conference Committee
Conference Adopted Amendment
2-28trans-approp_caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
Transportation - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
1-24 trans-approp
Senate Fact Sheet
6-13 as enacted
Senate Fact Sheet
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
May 28, 2008: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
May 22, 2008: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
- Present/NV: 9
April 10, 2008: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 6
March 18, 2008: Transportation: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
March 18, 2008: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
March 12, 2008: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
January 14, 2008: Transportation: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
January 14, 2008: Appropriations: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor