+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 29, 2012 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Final disposition: Held in House
On March 15, 2012 in the House:
- Appropriations: Withdrawn
On March 14, 2012 in the House:
- Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
On March 7, 2012 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Military Affairs and Public Safety
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment withdrawn: BSFSS (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: APPROP (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: RULES (ref APPROP)
- Amendment adopted: Allen #1 flr amend (ref APPROP)
- Amendment adopted: Allen #2 flr amend (ref APPROP)
On February 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended with recommendation for a floor amendment
On February 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On January 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty: Do pass amended
On January 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 11, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (14)
Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Allen #2 flr amend (ref APPROP) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Allen #1 flr amend (ref APPROP) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty
Senate Adopted Amendment
Allen #2 flr amend (ref APPROP) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Allen #1 flr amend (ref APPROP) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 7, 2012: Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
March 7, 2012: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
March 1, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 10
January 11, 2012: Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 6
January 11, 2012: Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor