+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 5:07PM.
- Objection to the consent calendar.
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee: do pass.
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:04PM.
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Judiciary Committee: do pass.
On January 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Votes (4)
February 20, 2017: House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 20, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 2, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
January 17, 2017: Senate Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 7