+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee: do pass.
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- TRANSIT (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Transportation and Technology Committee: do pass amended.
On January 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Transportation and Technology Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
April 20, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 24
February 20, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 20, 2017: House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
February 13, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 6
January 17, 2017: Senate Transportation and Technology Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1