+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 26, 2008 in the House:
- Final disposition: Held in House
- House second read
On March 25, 2008 in the House:
- Rules
- Trans
- Com
- Assigned to committee: Government
- House first read
On March 20, 2008 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 20, 2008 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: PSHS (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: TRANS (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Gray L flr amend (ref TRANS) (sub RULES)
On March 6, 2008 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
On February 26, 2008 in the Senate:
- Transportation: Do pass amended
On January 31, 2008 in the Senate:
- Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass amended
On January 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 14, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Transportation
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety and Human Services
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (10)
Public Safety and Human Services
Senate Proposed Amendment
Transportation
Senate Proposed Amendment
Transportation
Senate Proposed Amendment
Transportation
Senate Proposed Amendment
Transportation
Senate Proposed Amendment
Public Safety and Human Services
Senate Proposed Amendment
Transportation
Senate Adopted Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Gray L Floor Amendment; reference to TRANS amendment; sub to RULES amendment
Senate Adopted Amendment
Public Safety and Human Services
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 20, 2008: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 2
January 14, 2008: Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
January 14, 2008: Transportation: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 2