+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 21, 2012 in the House:
- Final disposition: Held in House
- House second read
On February 20, 2012 in the House:
- Rules
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- House first read
On February 9, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On January 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 1:56 pm
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On January 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On January 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 11, 2012 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Senate first read
+ − Amendment
1-19 jud
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (2)
February 9, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
January 11, 2012: Judiciary: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor