+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus.
- Conference committee recommended.
- Senate concurred.
- Final reading in Senate: Passed
- Transmit to Governor.
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- COM - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on Committee of the Whole consent calendar at 2:19PM.
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- House Commerce Committee: do pass amended.
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Commerce Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- TRANSIT (ref Bill) adopted
- Worsley flr amend (ref TRANSIT) (sub RULES) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration amended.
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Transportation and Technology Committee: do pass amended.
On January 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Transportation and Technology Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (6)
March 21, 2017: Senate Final Reading
- Yeas: 30
March 20, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 57
February 27, 2017: House Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 27, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 9
February 21, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
January 17, 2017: Senate Transportation and Technology Committee
- Yeas: 7