+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 79 w/o
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Government and Higher Education: Do pass
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Government and Higher Education
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On January 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:18 pm
On January 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Public Safety, Military and Technology: Do pass
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety, Military and Technology
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Votes (5)
March 24, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 3
February 24, 2015: Government and Higher Education: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
February 24, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
January 29, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
January 20, 2015: Public Safety, Military and Technology: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor