+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- House Health & Human Services Committee: do pass.
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Health & Human Services Committee.
- First read in House.
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On January 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On January 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 2:11PM.
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On January 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Health and Human Services Committee: do pass.
On January 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Health and Human Services Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Votes (3)
March 4, 2020: House Health & Human Services Committee
- Yeas: 9
January 30, 2020: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
January 13, 2020: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor