+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus.
- Conference committee recommended.
- Senate concurred.
- Final reading in Senate: Passed
- Transmit to Governor.
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Floor Amend to Bill - Bowers - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: Passed
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- JPS - passed
- Floor Amend to Bill - Bowers - substituted
- SUB Floor Amend to BOWERS to Bill - Kern - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: retained on calendar.
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee: do pass amended.
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- JUD (ref Bill) adopted
- Petersen flr amend (ref JUD) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Judiciary Committee: do pass amended.
On January 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (6)
May 10, 2017: Senate Final Reading
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 13
May 9, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 21
March 2, 2017: House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
March 2, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 28, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 13
January 17, 2017: Senate Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor