+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 23, 2010 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 113
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On April 19, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate concurrence
- Senate final read: Passed
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 13, 2010 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment: MAPS - passed as amended
On April 13, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 13, 2010 in the House:
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to MAPS - Biggs
- Third read: Passed
On April 6, 2010 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 5, 2010 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 31, 2010 in the House:
- Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On March 24, 2010 in the House:
- House second read
On March 23, 2010 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Military Affairs and Public Safety
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 15, 2010 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: PSHS (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: RULES (ref PSHS)
- Amendment adopted: Pearce R (ref Bill)
On February 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
On January 20, 2010 in the Senate:
- Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass amended
On January 14, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 13, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety and Human Services
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (16)
Military Affairs and Public Safety - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Public Safety and Human Services
Senate Adopted Amendment
Military Affairs and Public Safety - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Pearce Floor Amendment; reference to printed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
Biggs Floor amendment; reference to the Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Public Safety and Human Services
Senate Proposed Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Military Affairs and Public Safety - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Pearce Floor Amendment; reference to printed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
Public Safety and Human Services
Senate Adopted Amendment
Military Affairs and Public Safety - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Biggs Floor amendment; reference to the Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
2-25 pshs_aspassed
Senate Fact Sheet
1-22 pshs_caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
Public Safety and Human Services
Senate Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
April 19, 2010: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 2
April 13, 2010: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 21
- Present/NV: 4
March 23, 2010: Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
March 23, 2010: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 3
February 15, 2010: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 13
January 13, 2010: Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (37)
Type:
Primary Sponsor