+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 139
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- Senate concurrence
- Senate final read: Passed
- Transmitted to: Governor
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment: CMA
- Amendment passed: SUB Floor Amend to CMA - Coleman
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- County and Municipal Affairs: Do pass amended
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: County and Municipal Affairs
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: PSMT (ref Bill)
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Safety, Military and Technology: Do pass amended
On January 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety, Military and Technology
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (5)
Public Safety, Military and Technology
Senate Proposed Amendment
County and Municipal Affairs
House Proposed Amendment
Public Safety, Military and Technology
Senate Adopted Amendment
County and Municipal Affairs
House Adopted Amendment
SUB Floor Amend to CMA - Coleman - passed
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
March 26, 2015: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 2
March 23, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 21
- Present/NV: 3
February 24, 2015: County and Municipal Affairs: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
February 24, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
February 9, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 1
January 20, 2015: Public Safety, Military and Technology: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor