+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On June 13, 2013 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
- Final disposition: Held in House
On June 11, 2013 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On June 10, 2013 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On June 4, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Reform and Human Services: Withdrawn
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- House second read
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- House first read
- Transmit to House
- Assigned to committee: Reform and Human Services
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: RULES (ref HHS)
- Amendment adopted: HHS (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Health and Human Services: Do pass amended
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Health and Human Services
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (10)
Health and Human Services
Senate Adopted Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Health and Human Services
Senate Proposed Amendment
Health and Human Services
Senate Proposed Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
House Proposed Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
House Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
June 4, 2013: Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 4
March 5, 2013: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
March 4, 2013: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
January 17, 2013: Health and Human Services: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor